SHEFFIELD WILDLIFE TRUST

Charity number: 700638
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 15 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 15 December 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 28 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 09 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 09 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 05 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 05 November 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 18 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 18 December 2017 On time Download