SHEFFIELD WILDLIFE TRUST

Charity number: 700638
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £1.33m £1.52m £1.73m £2.74m £2.66m
Total expenditure £1.19m £1.42m £1.57m £2.04m £2.02m
Income from government contracts £55.00k £19.31k £151.17k £34.67k N/A
Income from government grants £125.85k £111.25k £142.14k £152.65k £27.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £324.26k £296.30k £316.68k £673.32k £325.39k
Income - Other trading activities £7.50k £50.28k £4.87k £193.33k £0
Income - Charitable activities £972.13k £1.15m £1.39m £1.85m £2.12m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £22.24k £22.56k £23.51k £22.86k £20.87k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £190.14k
Income - Legacies £4.74k £0 £1.50k £51.95k £12.18k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.10m £1.31m £1.46m £1.94m £1.91m
Expenditure - Raising funds £94.02k £111.89k £108.33k £106.49k £104.38k
Expenditure - Governance £24.31k £26.74k £26.00k £41.74k £38.84k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0