Accounts and annual returns EAST DURHAM COMMUNITY INITIATIVES LTD

Charity number: 701917
Charity reporting is up to date (56 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 28 March 2022 56 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 28 March 2022 56 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 04 February 2021 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 04 February 2021 4 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 21 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 21 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 13 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 13 December 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 04 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 04 December 2017 On time Download Open in new window