DAUBHILL MUSLIM SOCIETY

Charity number: 702789
Charity reporting is up to date (59 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £469.92k £473.73k £544.21k £538.64k £549.48k
Total expenditure £421.56k £428.87k £501.97k £435.78k £471.49k
Income from government contracts £298.71k £299.30k £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A £336.32k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £544.21k £538.64k £49.29k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £0 £0 £500.19k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £501.97k £435.78k £432.67k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £38.83k