Financial history ENGLISH DISABLED FLY FISHERS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 800452
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £6.15k £7.56k £11.62k £2.08k £3.83k
Total expenditure £7.87k £7.51k £11.53k £320 £2.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A