COLLEGE FOR HIGHER RABBINICAL STUDIES

Charity number: 803466
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 11 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 13 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 13 August 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 06 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 06 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 12 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 12 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 18 July 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 18 July 2016 On time Download