THE SOCIETY OF THE GUILDFORD SYMPHONY ORCHESTRA

Charity number: 803751
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 11 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 11 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 26 October 2020 179 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 26 October 2020 179 days late Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 24 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 24 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 13 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 13 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2016 28 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 28 January 2017 On time Download