THE CHURCH OF THE HOLY SPIRIT/RESEARCH AND ENLIGHTENMENT CENTRE TRUST

Charity number: 900101
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020
Total gross income £8.07k £7.00k £9.76k £6.28k £2.58k
Total expenditure £5.29k £4.92k £6.49k £8.39k £19.38k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A