BREAKTHROUGH BREAST CANCER

Charity number: 1062636
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 16 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 31 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2017 16 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2016 03 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2015 26 April 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2015 26 April 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)