CLINKS

Charity number: 1074546
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 12 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 12 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 18 February 2019 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 18 February 2019 18 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 13 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 13 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 17 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 17 November 2016 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2015 18 November 2015 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 18 November 2015 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)