CAMBRIDGE CONVOY REFUGEE ACTION GROUP

Charity number: 1170180
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 28 June 2020 59 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 28 June 2020 59 days late Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 30 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 30 April 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 20 June 2018 51 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 20 June 2018 51 days late Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)