THE MARGARET LOGAN BEER CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1071947
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 14 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 06 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 23 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 04 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2016 20 July 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 Not Required
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)