THE NATIONAL COACHING FOUNDATION

Charity number: 327354
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 25 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 25 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 04 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 04 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 22 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 22 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 13 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 13 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 13 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016

( These accounts
have been qualified)

13 December 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)