OPERATION EMOTION

Charity number: 1177098
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 24 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 24 August 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 21 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 22 May 2019 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)