ZELLWEGER UK

Charity number: 1166389
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 21 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 21 May 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 09 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 09 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 01 September 2017 15 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2017 15 January 2018 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)