THE BOOTH CENTRE

Charity number: 1062674
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 24 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 24 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 17 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 17 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 25 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 25 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 12 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 12 January 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2015 07 September 2015 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 07 September 2015 On time
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)