COMPASSION UK CHRISTIAN CHILD DEVELOPMENT

Charity number: 1077216
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 14 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 14 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 22 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 22 March 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 27 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 27 April 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2016 22 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 22 March 2017 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2015 24 March 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2015 24 March 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)