MAGIC ME

Charity number: 328331
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 29 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 29 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 30 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 30 August 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 04 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 04 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 10 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 17 October 2016 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2015 25 January 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 30 October 2015 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)