SUFFOLK ARCHIVES FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1170463
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2019 31 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 31 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2018 22 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 22 February 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2017 12 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 12 January 2018 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)