EUROPEAN-ATLANTIC GROUP

Charity number: 274898
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 12 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 27 February 2020 119 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 10 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 27 November 2017 27 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 25 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 30 October 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)