THE ECOLOGICAL SEQUESTRATION TRUST

Charity number: 1143397
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 16 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 16 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 04 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 04 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 08 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 08 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 05 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 05 January 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2015 15 December 2015 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 28 January 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)