PANAVIA TORNADO PRESERVATION GROUP

Charity number: 1163207
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 19 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 19 April 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 14 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 14 August 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 30 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 30 August 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 29 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 29 August 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 20 July 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 03 April 2017 62 days late Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)