Financial history THE KINDU TRUST

Charity number: 1069574
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £128.72k £140.40k £152.99k £141.64k £135.19k
Total expenditure £133.63k £119.34k £123.84k £107.08k £117.32k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A