WORLD OBESITY FEDERATION

Charity number: 1076981
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £603.11k £759.77k £622.14k £2.44m £2.43m
Total expenditure £693.75k £763.83k £639.36k £2.09m £2.32m