ASSOCIATION FOR LEARNING TECHNOLOGY

Charity number: 1160039
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/01/2016 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £441,927 £462,656 £485,386 £456,960 £454,239
Total expenditure £432,798 £466,674 £461,239 £448,182 £457,534