THE CENTRAL ENGLAND AREA QUAKER MEETING CHARITIES

Charity number: 224571
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £1.48m £1.59m £1.54m £1.66m £1.56m
Total expenditure £1.61m £1.68m £1.50m £1.66m £1.57m