GINGERBREAD, THE CHARITY FOR SINGLE PARENT FAMILIES

Charity number: 230750
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Income from government contracts £1.10m £779.01k £229.84k £1.07m £498.34k
Income from government grants £541.46k £469.73k £0 N/A £210.00k
Other income £1.93m £1.93m £2.64m £2.66m £2.33m
Total expenditure £3.65m £3.46m £3.03m £3.88m £3.48m