SURVIVAL INTERNATIONAL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 267444
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £1.73m £1.26m £2.29m £1.53m £1.85m
Total expenditure £1.13m £1.15m £1.16m £1.18m £1.46m