THE NIRVANA CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1104214
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Other income £7.86k £8.83k £7.31k £107.70k £107.70k
Total expenditure £47.56k £55.15k £53.09k £42.67k £42.67k