FRIENDS OF TEWKESBURY ABBEY

Charity number: 211236
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £50 N/A N/A
Other income £133.02k £105.09k £66.87k £72.72k £111.01k
Total expenditure £109.76k £143.60k £132.94k £147.36k £204.15k