INTERNATIONAL SEAFARERS' WELFARE AND ASSISTANCE NETWORK

Charity number: 1102946
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Other income £479,943 £764,319 £1,030,654 £989,916 £969,664
Total expenditure £718,123 £710,911 £1,015,545 £899,204 £1,026,619