THE NORTHAM CARE TRUST

Charity number: 1081784
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Income from government contracts £1,606,710 £0 £0 £761,835 £933,554
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A £6,890
Other income £109,936 £1,889,877 £2,077,627 £1,373,910 £1,497,399
Total expenditure £1,699,275 £1,886,804 £2,021,658 £2,106,129 £2,408,708