Financial history ZELLWEGER UK

Charity number: 1166389
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/09/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £18.33k £22.29k £32.74k £21.35k £20.05k
Total expenditure £12.23k £19.44k £32.15k £23.11k £2.52k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A