TOTNES MUSEUM TRUST

Charity number: 296684
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
28/02/2016 28/02/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £5.00k £5.00k £6.80k N/A £2.50k
Other income £13.45k £8.15k £14.86k £14.77k £18.42k
Total expenditure £15.54k £17.29k £22.92k £17.27k £27.24k