SIMPSON'S TRUST

Charity number: 505554
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total income £4.84k £8.96k £2.67k £2.31k £2.22k
Total expenditure £5.16k £3.87k £3.51k £2.81k £2.36k