THE ELIZABETH FOUNDATION

Charity number: 293835
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Income from government contracts £14,164 £20,457 £30,304 £26,640 N/A
Income from government grants £7,500 £0 £0 N/A £22,499
Other income £755,905 £478,505 £674,403 £930,521 £807,300
Total expenditure £706,286 £685,204 £662,606 £662,644 £754,999