THE MANSEL THOMAS TRUST

Charity number: 700480
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Other income £558 £314 £185 £514 £244
Total expenditure £339 £270 £123 £880 £240