CLINKS

Charity number: 1074546
Charity reporting is up to date

Governing document

Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.

MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12 MAY 1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10 DEC 1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26 MAR 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25 NOV 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23 FEB 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02 NOV 2017

Charitable objects

TO PROMOTE THE REHABILITATION OF OFFENDERS BY SUPPORTING VOLUNTARY AND COMMUNITY ORGANISATIONS WORKING WITH OR FOR OFFENDERS AND THEIR FAMILIES.

Area of benefit

The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.

NATIONAL