THE NATIONAL COACHING FOUNDATION

Charity number: 327354
Charity reporting is up to date

Governing document

Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.

MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23/01/1987 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/10/0093 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/06/1995 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 08/07/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/01/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/02/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/11/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/02/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03 OCT 2017 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 08 MAY 2018

Charitable objects

TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE EDUCATION OF ALL THOSE WHO USE COACHING TO DELIVER AND/OR ENCOURAGE SPORT AND PHYSICAL ACTIVITY.

Area of benefit

The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.

NOT DEFINED