CLINKS

Charity number: 1074546
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Raheel Mohammed Trustee 16 January 2018 None on record
Dr Alison Patricia Frater Trustee 27 January 2016 None on record
Simon Alsop Trustee 14 March 2019 None on record
Liz Calderbank Trustee 27 January 2016 None on record
Rachael Margaret Byrne Trustee 07 May 2014 None on record
Roma Hooper Chair 27 September 2018 None on record
JESSICA MARY SOUTHGATE Trustee 24 July 2017 None on record
Christopher Norman Stacey Trustee 11 January 2018 None on record