WORLD OBESITY FEDERATION

Charity number: 1076981
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PROFESSOR Alafia Samuels Trustee 06 November 2019 None on record
PROFESSOR BRIAN OLDFIELD Trustee 23 May 2018 None on record
Dr DONNA RYAN Trustee 03 May 2016 None on record
KARINE CLEMENT Trustee 03 May 2016 None on record
Dr DAVID YORK Trustee 03 May 2016 None on record
Dr JOHN WILDING Trustee 23 May 2018 None on record
Dr Victor Saavedra Gajardo Trustee 23 May 2018 None on record
ADAM JAMES MCCORMACK Trustee 16 September 2020 None on record
Dr Nathalie Farpour Lambert Trustee 30 April 2019 None on record
PROFESSOR CAROLINE APOVIAN Trustee 07 July 2020 None on record
Dr LOUISE BAUR Trustee 07 July 2020 None on record
Dr TERRY HUANG Trustee 03 May 2016 None on record
Dr JOSEPH PROIETTO Trustee 03 May 2016 None on record