LILIAN FAITHFULL CARE

Charity number: 1122183
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JANET ELIZABETH BALLINGER Trustee None on record
Alan Bishop Trustee 17 December 2014 None on record
Philip Pratt Trustee 12 June 2019 None on record
Martyn Smith Trustee 08 August 2018 None on record
Dame Janet Trotter Trustee 12 June 2019 None on record
GILL PYATT Chair None on record
ELEANOR MORAG SINCLAIR FOX Trustee 01 October 2012 None on record
GARETH PARRY Trustee 17 January 2013 None on record
JANE GWENDOLINE WOODLEY Trustee 04 October 2012 None on record
Fiona Court Trustee 08 August 2018 None on record