THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER AND ST PAUL, DORCHESTER ON THAMES

Charity number: 1133787
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Michael John Thrift Trustee 09 April 2017 None on record
KAREN PATRICIA DREW Trustee 09 April 2017 None on record
Dr Hans-Joerg Paul Trustee 26 April 2015
DORCHESTER PAROCHIAL EDUCATION TRUST Charity reporting is up to date
Benjamin David White Trustee 14 March 2019 None on record
ALISON BRUCKER Trustee 26 April 2015 None on record
MR NICK FORMAN Trustee None on record
Susannah Christine Treherne Trustee 09 April 2017 None on record
SANDRA GRIFFITH Trustee None on record
Frances White Trustee 14 April 2019 None on record
Richard Winslet Trustee 09 April 2018 None on record
MALCOLM LUCAS Trustee 27 June 2013
DORCHESTER PAROCHIAL EDUCATION TRUST Charity reporting is up to date
Gail Valerie Thomas Trustee 14 July 2019
DORCHESTER PAROCHIAL EDUCATION TRUST Charity reporting is up to date
Rev Susan Elizabeth Booys Trustee
REVEREND F CHALKER'S CHARITY FOR CHURCH AND ALMSHOUSES Charity reporting is up to date
THE MERCY WARD CHURCH TRUST Charity reporting is up to date
DORCHESTER PAROCHIAL EDUCATION TRUST Charity reporting is up to date
RIPON COLLEGE CUDDESDON Charity reporting is up to date
YOUTH CHALLENGE OXFORDSHIRE Charity reporting is up to date
THE REVEREND JOSEPH GIBBS FOR ORGANIST Charity reporting is up to date