BALA LAKE RAILWAY TRUST

Charity number: 1151841
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SQUADRON LEADER TOBY KENNETH WATKINS Trustee 30 April 2013 None on record
Steve Valentine Trustee 09 July 2018 None on record
JULIAN PETER CHARLES BIRLEY Chair 18 February 2013
THE LOCOMOTIVE CONSERVATION AND LEARNING TRUST Charity reporting is up to date
ROGER HINE Trustee 04 December 2014 None on record
CHRISTINA LILLIAN KENNEDY Trustee 30 April 2013
CARYMOOR ENVIRONMENTAL TRUST Charity reporting is up to date
Steve Davies Trustee 10 July 2017
THE FRIENDS OF THE SIERRA LEONE NATIONAL RAILWAY MUSEUM Charity reporting is up to date
THE DUKE OF LANCASTER'S REGIMENT LANCASHIRE INFANTRY MUSEUM Charity reporting is 78 days late
THE A1 STEAM LOCOMOTIVE TRUST Charity reporting is up to date