Trustees REIGATE AND REDHILL U3A
Charity number: 297529
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PATRICIA MARY COCKETT | Chair |
|
|
|||||
John Hugh deMowbray Winter | Trustee | 02 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Frances Busby | Trustee | 02 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Clare Stoddart | Trustee | 27 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Heather Mary Earl | Trustee | 27 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jill Mandy Flower | Trustee | 10 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Angela Susan Austin | Trustee | 04 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sheena Low McKenzie | Trustee | 02 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Ruth Haimes | Trustee | 02 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lloyd Chapman | Trustee | 28 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
John White Winter Cousins | Trustee | 04 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Martin Livesey | Trustee | 05 October 2018 |
|
|||||
Lynne Scott Douglas | Trustee | 05 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Ann Viner-Loney | Trustee | 06 October 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.