WELSH GUARDS CHARITY

Charity number: 1152766
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Owen Gareth James Trustee 09 April 2020 None on record
TA Cooper Trustee 01 June 2013 None on record
JAJ Price Trustee 01 June 2014 None on record
Captain RS Mason Trustee 01 June 2013 None on record
Major General RJAE Stanford MBE Chair 01 July 2015 None on record
SC Rhodes Trustee 01 June 2013 None on record
Captain TC MacDonald-Milner Trustee 01 June 2013 None on record
Mrs M Bowen Trustee 06 April 2016 None on record
Captain BMH Branston Trustee 01 June 2013 None on record
Captain RAJ Forrest Trustee 27 September 2017 None on record
Captain PWH Craig-Cooper Trustee 27 September 2017 None on record