THE ELIZABETH FOUNDATION

Charity number: 293835
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Waleed Sabri Ahmed Al-Safi Trustee 25 July 2018 None on record
Martin Waters Trustee 01 May 2019 None on record
Dr PETER HERBERT ARDERN Chair None on record
Thomas Charles Robert Holloway Trustee 24 July 2019 None on record
Andrew John Given Trustee 22 July 2020 None on record
Sarah Jane Hutchinson BSc FCA Trustee 29 April 2014 None on record
Imogen Lucy Maughan Trustee 02 November 2016 None on record