Skip to Content
CHARITY COMMISSION
FOR ENGLAND AND WALES
englishcymraeg

Log in to digital service

  1. About the register of charities

Search the register of charities

You can only export a maximum of 10,000 records. Please refine your search or download the full register.
Search in:
Search filters (selected)
Registration details (selected)

Registration details Skip to Income and expenditure

DD/MM/YYYY for example 12/11/2003
DD/MM/YYYY for example 12/11/2004
DD/MM/YYYY for example 01/03/2012
DD/MM/YYYY for example 01/05/2012
Income and expenditure

Income and expenditure Skip to Employee benefits

Income range

For example 25000. Do not enter special characters
For example 47800. Do not enter special characters

Expenditure range

For example 50000. Do not enter special characters
For example 478500. Do not enter special characters

Employee benefits Skip to Classifications

Select to search for charities with at least one employee receiving the benefits within that range.
Classifications

Classifications Skip to Charities working nationally in England and Wales

What the charity does
Who the charity helps
How the charity helps
Area of operation

Charities working nationally in England and Wales Skip to Charities working locally in England and Wales

Only includes charities who have said they work in a specific area. For example, 'throughout London' will not show charities that work throughout the whole of England, or only in certain London boroughs.

Charities working locally in England and Wales Skip to Charities working outside England and Wales

Only includes charities who have said they work in a specific local area. For example, a search for a specific local area in England will not include charities who have said they work throughout all of England.

Local areas in England
London Boroughs
Local areas in Wales
Charities working outside England and Wales Skip to Search
Country
No results were found
Search results ordered by Charity name(Descending)
Charity number
Charity name
Status
Income
Reporting
244137 TRUST PROPERTY HELD IN CONNECTION WITH SALTAIRE UNITED REFORMED CHURCH Registered £105,293 Overdue by 53 days
506751 TRUST PROPERTY HELD IN CONNECTION WITH LONG SUTTON ROYAL BRITISH LEGION Registered £0 Received: On time
249148 TRUST PROPERTY HELD IN CONNECTION WITH BROTHER SERVANTS OF THE BLESSED VIRGIN SERVITE FATHERS Registered £1,009,759 Received: On time
327357 TRUST PROPERTY HELD ICW THE ENGLISH PROVINCE OF THE CONGREGATION OF THE SISTERS OF THE PRESENTATION OF THE BLESSED VIRGIN MARY Registered £3,137,571 Received: On time
245817 TRUST PROPERTY HELD ICW STAR ST CONGREGATIONAL CHURCH Registered £635 Overdue by 1606 days
217492 TRUST PROPERTY HELD FOR ECCLESIASTICAL PURPOSES IN CONNEXION WITH THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND Registered £0 Received: On time
245367 TRUST PROPERTY HELD BY TRUSTEES OF ST AUGUSTINE'S PRIORY Registered £102,751 Received: On time
1003266 TRUST PROPERTY FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN CONNECTION WITH THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND Registered £0 Received: On time
255862 TRUST PROPERTY DANISH LUTHERAN CHURCH OF ST NICOLAI Registered £4,061 Received: On time
221986 TRUST PROPERTY COMPRISED IN AN INDENTURE DATED 5 SEPTEMBER 1908 KNOWN AS WADE'S CROFT Registered £620 Received: On time
221987 TRUST PROPERTY COMPRISED IN AN INDENTURE DATED 16 MARCH 1910 Registered £1,575 Received: On time
251227 TRUST PROPERTY AND FUNDS HELD IN CONNEXION WITH SERBIAN ORTHODOX CHURCH OF ST LAZAR Registered £100,166 Received: On time
236173 TRUST PROPERTY AND FUNDS HELD IN CONNECTION WITH ST COLUMBA'S CHURCH AND CONGREGATION Registered £723,410 Received: On time
238229 TRUST PROPERTY ADMINISTERED IN CONNECTION WITH THE RELIGIOUS OF MARY IMMACULATE Registered £5,736,506 Received: On time
522857 TRUST PROPERTY ADMINISTERED IN CONNECTION WITH THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND Registered £572 Received: On time
1057301 TRUST OF ST JAMES THE GREAT AT ST KEW Registered £2,291 Received: On time
1131018 TRUST OF MRS E M SIDGWICK Registered £39,579 Received: On time
234519 TRUST FUNDS HELD IN CONNECTION WITH ST GEORGE'S UNITED REFORMED CHURCH Registered £34,991 Received: On time
506561 TRUST FUND HELD IN CONNEXION WITH ST PETER'S CHURCH Registered £8,882 Received: On time
1088780 TRUST FOR THE FRIENDS OF THE CHURCH OF ST. MICHAEL AND ALL ANGELS BRODSWORTH Registered £7,477 Overdue by 1606 days
20 Entries Per Page
  • 5 Entries per Page
  • 10 Entries per Page
  • 20 Entries per Page
  • 30 Entries per Page
  • 50 Entries per Page
  • 75 Entries per Page

Showing 761 to 780 of 18,375 entries.

  • Previous Page
  • Page1
  • ... Intermediate Pages
    • Page2
    • Page3
    • Page4
    • Page5
    • Page6
    • Page7
    • Page8
    • Page9
    • Page10
    • Page11
    • Page12
    • Page13
    • Page14
    • Page15
    • Page16
    • Page17
    • Page18
    • Page19
  • Page38
  • Page39
  • Page40
  • ... Intermediate Pages
    • Page41
    • Page42
    • Page43
    • Page44
    • Page45
    • Page46
    • Page47
    • Page48
    • Page49
    • Page50
    • Page51
    • Page52
    • Page53
    • Page54
    • Page55
    • Page56
    • Page57
    • Page58
    • Page59
    • Page60
  • Page919
  • Next Page
Save and Close

Tell us whether you accept cookies

We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.

We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.

Accept all cookies Set cookie preferences
Was this page useful?

Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window

Charity Commission's privacy notice – how we use your personal information

 

Cookies         Accessibility Statement-Register of charities   Accessibility Statement-RSI Forms

 

All content is available under the Open Government Licence v3.0 , except where otherwise stated

 

© Crown copyright