Governing document THE ORATORY SCHOOLS ASSOCIATION
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 17/09/1931 AND MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 01/01/1950 AND 01/01/1964 AND 11/06/1980 AND 16/06/1982 AND CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION UPON CHANGE OF NAME DATE 18/03/2011
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE GENERAL, PHYSICAL, MORAL AND RELIGIOUS EDUCATION FOR BOYS AND/OR GIRLS IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD AND FOR THAT PURPOSE TO CARRY ON AND MAINTAIN THE ORATORY SCHOOL WHEREVER THE SAME MAY BE CARRIED ON.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED, IN PRACTICE LOCAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.