Trustees MOSTYN GALLERY LIMITED
Charity number: 507842
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jeremy Salisbury | Chair | 15 March 2012 |
|
|||||
David James Lloyd | Trustee | 20 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Helen Weaver | Trustee | 20 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrea Bernardi | Trustee | 20 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Susan Gail Shotter | Trustee | 23 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mark Pavey | Trustee | 20 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Greg Robbins | Trustee | 13 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Vanessa Jane Griffiths | Trustee | 30 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Ifan Derfel Thomas | Trustee | 30 September 2016 |
|
|||||
Sabine Brigitte Cockrill | Trustee | 06 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
ALFREDO CRAMEROTTI | Trustee | 05 February 2014 |
|
|||||
Mr E Williams | Trustee | 27 January 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.